IL HB2584 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Debt Reform Act. Provides that all bonds, including general obligation bonds and revenue bonds issued under the Act, shall be secured by a statutory lien on all revenues received or entitled to be received. Provides that the statutory lien shall automatically attach from the time the bonds are issued without further action or authorization by the governing authority of the local public entity. Provides that the lien shall be a first priority lien unless the bonds so otherwise provide. Provides that the provisions apply to all bonds issued by a local public entity, including bonds issued by a local public entity with home rule authority, and that the bonds shall have all of the protection afforded to special revenue bonds under the federal Bankruptcy Code. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOVT DEBT-STATUTORY LIEN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 014-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |