IL HB2583 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax deduction for an amount of up to $50,000 per tax year contributed to a small business asset purchase account and all interest earned on such accounts during the tax year. Provides that a "small business asset purchase account" means an account established by a taxpayer, the proceeds of which are used to purchase property used primarily in Illinois for which a federal income tax deduction is claimed under Section 179 of the Internal Revenue Code. Provides an addition modification for amounts withdrawn from a small business asset purchase account that are not used for qualified purchases. Amends the Uniform Penalty and Interest Act to establish a penalty for improper use of moneys in a small business asset purchase account. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-SMALL BUSINESS ACCT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 735 | 3-3.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2583&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2583.htm |