IL HB2581 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants, a taxpayer who has been granted a senior citizens homestead exemption need not reapply for the exemption. Provides that the county assessor shall establish procedures with the county recorder of deeds or the county clerk, as applicable, to determine whether a person who has been granted a senior citizens homestead exemption has conveyed ownership of the property or is deceased. Provides that, if the person has conveyed ownership of the property or is deceased, then the county assessor shall mail notice to the new owner of the property stating that (i) the exemption will be removed from the property and (ii) the new property owner may reapply for the exemption if the property becomes qualified.
Title
PROP TAX-SENIOR HOMESTEAD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-08-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-07-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-07-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-07-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-06-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-06-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-06-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-06-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2581&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2581.htm |