IL HB2581 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0071
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0071
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Toll Highway Act. Provides that when the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority has built or will build grade separations or interchange improvements at intersections with any railroads, waterways, street railways, streets, thoroughfares, public roads, or highways intersected with the toll highways, the local highway agency or municipality with jurisdiction shall enter into an agreement with the Authority for the ongoing maintenance of the structures.
Title
TOLL HWY-GRADE SEPARATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0071 |
2017-08-11 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Tollway Oversight Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Tollway Oversight Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 10 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |