IL HB2580 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0070
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0070
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that upon a declaration by the Governor that an emergency harvest situation exists, a special permit issued by the Department of Transportation shall be required from September 1 through December 31 during harvest season emergencies for a vehicle that exceeds the maximum axle weight and gross limits or a vehicle that exceeds its registered gross weight, provided that the vehicle's axle weight and gross weight do not both exceed 10% above the maximum specified limits, and does not exceed the vehicle's registered gross weight by 10%. Provides that all other restrictions that apply to permits issued shall apply during the declared time period and no fee shall be charged for the issuance of those permits. Provides that the permits issued by the Department are only valid on federal and State highways under the jurisdiction of the Department, except interstate highways. Provides that with respect to highways under the jurisdiction of local authorities, the local authorities may, at their discretion, waive special permit requirements during harvest season emergencies, and set a divisible load weight limit not to exceed 10% of a vehicle's registered gross weight, provided that the vehicle's axle weight and gross weight do not exceed 10% above the maximum specified limits. Provides that any vehicle operating under an emergency harvest permit shall not be in violation of a Section concerning the effect of provisions within the original and renewal of registration Article of the Illinois Vehicle Code. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-EXCESS WEIGHT AG EXEMPT
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0070 |
2017-08-11 | House | Effective Date August 11, 2017 |
2017-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Back To Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; |
2017-03-28 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Subcommittee/ Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | To Highways & Transit Subcommittee |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 15-301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |