IL HB2577 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Marriage and Family Therapy Licensing Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning social security numbers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 013-000-000
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2017-05-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 014-000-000
2017-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-03-23HouseRe-assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-24HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2255532Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback