IL HB2572 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the Act may be referred to as the Children and Young Adult Mental Health Crisis Act. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to restructure the Family Support Program (Program) to: (i) enable early treatment of a child or young adult with serious mental health needs; (ii) align the program with system of care principles; and (iii) include both community-based and residential treatment services. Contains provisions on the new hallmarks of the Program; federal Medicaid matching dollars; an In-Home Therapy Pilot Program; and other matters. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Requires a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance, or managed care plan, that is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed after June 30, 2020 to provide coverage for: (i) coordinated specialty care for first episode psychosis treatment and (ii) assertive community treatment and community support team treatment. Contains provisions concerning mental health professionals; service payments; and other matters. Makes conforming changes to other Acts. Amends the Substance Use Disorder Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to allow outpatient substance use treatment providers to keep a substance use treatment case open for 90 days when a person has not received a treatment service during such period. Amends the Adoption Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to establish and maintain a toll-free number to respond to requests from the public about its post-placement and post-adoption support services; and to review and update its Post Adoption and Guardianship Services booklet. Requires the Department and the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to coordinate in the development of specified resources. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-MENTAL HEALTH-YOUTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 019-000-000
2019-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.3fAmended CodeCitation Text
2030155-36New CodeSee Bill Text
2151255-3Amended CodeCitation Text
2155356z.33New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-36New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-37New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-38New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-39New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-5.23Amended CodeCitation Text
51005-45Amended CodeCitation Text
53756.11Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1069.3Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-4-2.3Amended CodeCitation Text
750501Amended CodeCitation Text
7505018.9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback