IL HB2572 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Department of Military Affairs to convey described real estate in Tazewell County. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DPT MIL AFF LAND CONVEYANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-09-22HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0521
2017-09-22HouseEffective Date September 22, 2017
2017-09-22HouseGovernor Approved
2017-07-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-29HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-29House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
2017-06-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-000-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tim Butler
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Brady
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-05-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tim Butler
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2017-04-27HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-000-000
2017-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017
2017-03-31HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-03-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback