IL HB2571 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the COVID-19 Immunity Act. Provides that an individual, business, or unit of local government shall not be liable in a civil action claiming an injury from exposure or potential exposure to COVID-19 if the act or omission alleged to violate a duty of care of the individual, business, or unit of local government was in compliance or consistent with federal or State regulations, a presidential or gubernatorial executive order, or guidance applicable at the time of the alleged exposure. Provides that immunity does not apply to willful misconduct, reckless infliction of harm, or intentional infliction of harm. Effective immediately.
Title
COVID-19 IMMUNITY ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Murphy [R] | Rep. Tom Weber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | To Civil Procedure & Tort Liability Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-010-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2571&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2571.htm |