IL HB2571 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Flag Display Act. Provides that for the period of time spanning December 3, 2017 through December 31, 2018, a United States flag bearing 21 stars shall be flown from the flag pole of the Illinois State Capitol Building in celebration of Illinois' bicentennial as the 21st state to join the Union. Provides that the flag used shall conform to certain specified requirements. Repeals the Section on January 1, 2019. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FLAG DISPLAY-21 STAR US FLAG

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2018
2018-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-02-14SenateRe-assigned to State Government
2017-05-19SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
546515New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback