IL HB2571 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0668
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0668
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Flag Display Act. Provides that for the period of time spanning December 3, 2017 through December 31, 2018, a United States flag bearing 21 stars shall be flown from the flag pole of the Illinois State Capitol Building in celebration of Illinois' bicentennial as the 21st state to join the Union. Provides that the flag used shall conform to certain specified requirements. Repeals the Section on January 1, 2019. Effective immediately.
Title
FLAG DISPLAY-21 STAR US FLAG
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0668 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date August 3, 2018 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-10 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Re-assigned to State Government |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |