IL HB2570 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Military Code of Illinois. Provides that families of Illinois National Guard members who have died while on active duty or during training shall be presented with the State flag of Illinois, appropriate for use as a burial flag, upon application of a member of the family of the deceased Illinois National Guard member. Provides that the Adjutant General or the Adjutant General's designee shall present the State flag of Illinois to the family of the deceased member of the Illinois National Guard.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NATL GUARD-FUNERAL-STATE FLAG

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-30SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20180528.7New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback