IL HB2568 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0439
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0439
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Safety Employee Benefits Act. Provides that a health insurance plan, as defined, is limited to the insurance plan options codified in the employee collective bargaining agreement or bargained upon with an authorized agent and subject to the grievance process.
Title
PSEBA HLTH PLAN BARGAINED
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0439 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-001 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Labor |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 024-002-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 320 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |