IL HB2568 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Designations Act. Designates milkweed as the official State wildflower of the State of Illinois. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DESIGNATIONS-STATE WILDFLOWER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-008-001
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2017-05-19SenateReported Back To State Government; 003-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-12SenateTo Subcommittee on State Designations
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-03-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-30SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-29SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-008-000
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
546043New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback