IL HB2567 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Transportation Act. Contains only a short title provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRANSPORTATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-15HouseRe-assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback