IL HB2561 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that any person incarcerated on a bailable offense who does not supply bail and against whom a fine is levied on conviction of such offense shall be allowed a credit of $30 (rather than $5) for each day so incarcerated upon application of the defendant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-INCARCERATION CREDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255110-14Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback