IL HB2559 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Makes a technical change in Section on petition to change name.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIV PRO-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-03-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Civil Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-23HouseRe-assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
735521-102Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback