IL HB2556 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Meat and Poultry Inspection Act. Provides that a carcass, part thereof, meat or meat food product, or poultry or poultry food product is misbranded if it purports to be or is represented as a meat or meat food product or poultry or poultry product but is a cell-cultured food product. Defines "cell-cultured food product". Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Provides that a food is misbranded if it purports to be or is represented as a meat or meat food product or poultry or poultry product but is a cell-cultured food product as defined in the Meat and Poultry Inspection Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CELL-CULTURED FOOD PRODUCTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2256502Amended CodeCitation Text
41062011Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback