IL HB2554 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that a notice under the Tax Deeds and Procedures Article must contain a notice in 9 non-English languages encouraging the reader to have the notice translated because it contains important information about property taxes and may affect the person's ownership of the property. Requires a statement to be added to the notice of expiration of the period of redemption regarding limited reimbursement rights. Modifies service requirements of the notice. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Adds provisions regarding continuation or termination of bona fide leases in residential real estate in properties conveyed by a tax deed. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-NOTICE/BONA FIDE LEASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 22-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 22-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 22-4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | 9-121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-207.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | 9-207.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2554&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2554.htm |