IL HB2553 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates Protecting Household Privacy Act. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with these exceptions. Changes the exceptions in which law enforcement agency may obtain household electronic data. Provides that a law enforcement agency may obtain the data (1) if a law enforcement agency first obtains a warrant under the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963; (2) a specified emergency situation exists; or (3) with the lawful consent of the owner of the household electronic device or person in actual or constructive possession of the household electronic device, excluding law enforcement personnel. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to apply to the interception, recording, wiretap, or other acquisition of electronic communications as they are transmitted in real time. Provides that in the event of any conflict between the Act and any applicable federal or State law, the requirement that establishes the higher standard for law enforcement to obtain information shall govern.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROTECTING HOUSEHOLD PRIVACY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2021-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2021-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000
2021-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ann M. Williams
2021-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2021-05-29HouseArrived in House
2021-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2021-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Castro
2021-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2021
2021-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2021-05-20SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-05-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
2021-05-19SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
2021-05-18SenateReported Back To Judiciary; 003-000-000
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
2021-05-12SenateTo Judiciary- Privacy
2021-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
2021-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
2021-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2021-05-04SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-04-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-04-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-04-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-04-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2021-04-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2021-04-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2021-04-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2021-04-22HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2021-04-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-04-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2021-04-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-001
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-04-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-04-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2021-04-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-04-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-03-26HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000
2021-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2021-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2021-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2021-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-03-11HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-03-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback