IL HB2551 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0067
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0067
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Fire Marshal Act. Provides that the Office of the State Fire Marshal shall administer grants (currently, General Revenue Fund grants) to areas not located in a fire protection district or in a municipality which provides fire protection services, to defray the organizational expenses of forming a fire protection district. Amends the Law Enforcement and Fire Fighting Medal of Honor Act. Provides that members of the Fire Fighting Medal of Honor Committee shall serve without compensation but shall be reimbursed for actual expenses incurred in the performance of their duties from funds appropriated to the Office of the State Fire Marshal (currently, Office of the Governor) for such purpose. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE FIRE MARSHAL-GRANTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0067 |
2017-08-11 | House | Effective Date August 11, 2017 |
2017-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2905 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3985 | 3001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |