IL HB2547 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Racial Impact Note Act. Provides that every bill which has or could have a disparate impact on racial and ethnic minorities, upon the request of any member, shall have prepared for it, before second reading in the house of introduction, a brief explanatory statement or note that shall include a reliable estimate of the anticipated impact on those racial and ethnic minorities likely to be impacted by the bill. Specifies the contents and provides for the preparation of each racial impact note. Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Prohibits racial discrimination and harassment by State officers and employees. Provides that each State officer and employee shall annually complete a racial bias, discrimination, and harassment training program approved by the appropriate jurisdictional authority. Expands the jurisdiction of the Executive Ethics Commission to include allegations of racial discrimination and harassment by persons registered under the Lobbyist Registration Act. Provides that the personnel policies of units of local government shall prohibit racial discrimination and harassment. Defines "racial discrimination and harassment". Provides for rulemaking, including emergency rulemaking. Amends the Secretary of State Act. Provides the Secretary of State's Inspector General with jurisdiction to investigate complaints of racial discrimination and harassment by persons registered under the Lobbyist Registration Act. Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Prohibits racial discrimination and harassment by persons registered under the Lobbyist Registration Act. Provides that each registered lobbyist shall annually complete a racial bias, discrimination, and harassment training program approved by the Secretary of State. Defines "racial discrimination and harassment". Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Requires the Department of Human Rights to establish a racial discrimination and harassment hotline for the anonymous reporting of racial discrimination and harassment in both public and private places of employment, and to provide for reporting by both telephone and Internet. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to provide for emergency rulemaking. Effective immediately.
Title
RACIAL DISCRIMINATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-06 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 305 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 4.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 170 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 5-10.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 5-70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | 50-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 70-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 2-108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2547&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2547.htm |