IL HB2545 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Transit Authority Act. Provides that, on January 1, 2022 the Chicago Transit Authority shall become a division of the Regional Transportation Authority. Abolishes the Chicago Transit Board and provides that the Board of Directors of the Regional Transportation Authority will serve as the Board of the Chicago Transit Authority. Makes conforming changes. Amends the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that, on January 1, 2022 the Suburban Bus Board and the Commuter Rail Board are abolished and that the Board of Directors of the Regional Transportation Authority will directly operate the Suburban Bus Division and the Commuter Rail Division of the Regional Transit Authority. Creates various committees composed of Directors of the Board of the Regional Transportation Authority, including committees to oversee the operations of each Division of the Authority. Makes conforming changes. Amends the Open Meetings Act, State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, Broadband Access on Passenger Rail Law, and the Illinois Municipal Code making conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
CONSOLIDATE RTA SERVICE BOARDS
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | To Roadways, Rail & Aviation Subcommittee |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2545&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2545.htm |