IL HB2545 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With regard to training to identify the warning signs of mental illness and suicidal behavior, requires all personnel (rather than specific personnel) to undergo the training annually. Beginning with the 2017-2018 school year, requires this training to include a school district's policy on suicide awareness and prevention; makes related changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SUICIDE PREVENTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 011-000-000
2017-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Education
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-000-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.39Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.166Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback