IL HB2543 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that an interstate carrier operating intrastate may operate a motor vehicle upon the public roads of this State without the authority number of the carrier painted or affixed to any side of the cab or power unit. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-CARRIER-AUTHRITY NUMBER
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Unes [R] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] | Rep. Christine Winger [R] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0369 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 18c-4701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |