IL HB2543 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that when the Department of Children and Family Services first assumes custody of a child, in placing that child, the Department shall make reasonable efforts to identify, locate, and provide notice to all adult grandparents and other adult relatives of the child who are ready, willing, and able to care for the child (rather than the Department shall make reasonable efforts to identify and locate a relative who is ready, willing, and able to care for the child).
Title
DCFS-CUSTODY-NOTICE-RELATIVES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0340 |
2015-08-11 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 005-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2015-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-03-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2015-03-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |