IL HB2541 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Domestic Violence Act of 1986. In cases in which a petitioner seeks a prohibition on firearm possession, removes a requirement that the respondent receive actual notice of and an opportunity to participate in a hearing. Provides that an order of protection shall include a remedy that prohibits a respondent from possessing any firearms for a minimum of 2 years (instead of for the duration of the order of protection). Provides that any Firearm Owner's Identification Card in the possession of the respondent shall be suspended and turned over to a law enforcement agency of the court's choosing (rather than a local law enforcement agency). Makes other changes.
Title
ORDER PROTECT-GUN RESTRICTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-12-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-07-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-07-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-07-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-07-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-01-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-01-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 60 | 214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |