IL HB2540 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With respect to a school district petitioning to withdraw from its special education joint agreement program, provides that if the petition for withdrawal is not approved by all of the remaining member districts and the petitioning member district is a part of a Class II county school unit outside of a city of 500,000 or more inhabitants (suburban Cook County), the petitioning member district may appeal the disapproval decision to its respective intermediate service center. Provides that if the chief administrative officer of the intermediate service center approves the petition for withdrawal, then the petitioning member district shall be withdrawn from the joint agreement effective the following July 1 and shall notify the State Board of Education of the approved withdrawal in writing. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SPECIAL ED JT AGREEMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2017-04-25SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-30SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-000-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.31Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback