IL HB2536 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Expands the jurisdiction of the Executive Ethics Commission to include vendors and others doing business with State agencies (currently, officers and employees of State agencies). Effective immediately.
Title
EXEC ETHICS COMM-JURISDICTION
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 20-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2536&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2536.htm |