IL HB2535 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the Metropolitan Pier and Exposition Authority Act, the Illinois Sports Facilities Authority Act, and the Downstate Illinois Sports Facilities Authority Act. Provides that no tax is imposed under the Acts on the renting, leasing, or letting of hotel rooms to the American Red Cross for the provision or coordination of disaster relief services. Effective immediately.
Title
HOTEL TAX-RED CROSS
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Burke [D] | Rep. Arthur Turner [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] |
Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 145 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1030 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-74.3-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-3-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-3-14a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 210 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3205 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3210 | 105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2535&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2535.htm |