IL HB2534 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-17)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Requires that to be illegal a drug analog must not be approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration or, if approved, it is not dispensed or possessed in accordance with State and federal law. Defines "controlled substance" to include a synthetic drug enumerated as a scheduled drug under the Act. Adds chemical structural classes of synthetic cannabinoids and piperazines to the list of Schedule I controlled substances. Includes certain substances approved by the FDA which are not dispensed or possessed in accordance with State or federal law and certain modified substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CS-SYNTHETIC DRUGS AND ANALOGS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-05SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-03-28HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee;
2017-03-28HouseRecommends Do Pass as Amended Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-03-15HouseTo Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
2017-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720570102Amended CodeCitation Text
720570204Amended CodeCitation Text
720570401Amended CodeCitation Text
720570402Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback