IL HB2527 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Not For Profit Corporation Act of 1986. Provides that there must be an open meeting and vote of the membership before a residential housing cooperative may be dissolved.
Title
HOUSING COOP DISSOLUTION VOTE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0302 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Housing Committee; 009-000-000 |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Housing Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 105 | 107.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 105 | 112.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 105 | 112.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |