IL HB2525 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Employer's Liability Rates Article of the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a rate is excessive if it is likely to produce a long run profit that is unreasonably high for the insurance provided or if expenses are unreasonably high in relation to the services rendered. Repeals provisions regarding presumptions that a competitive market exists, determining whether a competitive market exists, and disapproval of rates under specified circumstances. Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that accidental injuries sustained while traveling to or from work do not arise out of and in the course of employment. Defines "in the course of employment" and "arising out of the employment". Permits an employer to file with the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission a workers' compensation safety program or a workers' compensation return to work program implemented by the employer. Provides that the Commission may certify any such safety program as a bona fide safety program after reviewing the program. In a provision concerning compensation for the period of temporary total incapacity for work resulting from an accidental injury, provides that (i) injuries to the shoulder shall be considered injuries to part of the arm and (ii) injuries to the hip shall be considered injuries to part of the leg. Contains provisions concerning repetitive and cumulative injuries; permanent partial disability determinations; electronic claims; annual reports by the Commission concerning the state of self-insurance for workers' compensation in Illinois; and duties of the Workers' Compensation Premium Rates Task Force; and other matters. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNEMP INS-WRKR COMP RATES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-25SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 008-003-000
2017-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-24SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-24SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-05-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-18SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateArrive in Senate
2017-05-18HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-27HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 066-050-000
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-25HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2017-04-25HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-04-18HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2017-04-13HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2017-04-13HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2017-04-13HousePension Note Filed
2017-04-12HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-03HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-24HouseJudicial Note Filed
2017-03-23HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-23HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-012-000
2017-03-08HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155456Amended CodeCitation Text
2155457Amended CodeCitation Text
2155458Amended CodeCitation Text
2155460Repealed CodeCitation Text
2155462aNew CodeSee Bill Text
8203051Amended CodeCitation Text
82030514Amended CodeCitation Text
82030519Amended CodeCitation Text
82030525.5Amended CodeCitation Text
82030529.2Amended CodeCitation Text
82030529.3New CodeSee Bill Text
8203054eNew CodeSee Bill Text
8203058Amended CodeCitation Text
8203058.1New CodeSee Bill Text
8203058.1bAmended CodeCitation Text
8203058.2aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback