IL HB2524 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Commercial Transportation Law of the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that no railroad operating within this State on any main line or any other line shall operate, or permit to be operated, any train that exceeds 8,500 feet in length. Contains a statement of legislative purpose, and defines "main line", "railroad", "train", and "train length".
Title
VEH CD-FREIGHT TRAIN LENGTH
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | To Roadways, Rail & Aviation Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 18c-7402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2524&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2524.htm |