IL HB2520 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $500,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Healthy Local Food Incentives Fund for the purposes set forth in subsection (d) of Section 12-4.50 of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
$HEALTHY LOCAL FOOD INCENTIVES
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Maura Hirschauer [D] | Rep. Mike Murphy [R] |
Rep. Delia Ramirez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-03-19 | House | To Special Issues (AP) Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2520&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/PDF/10200HB2520.pdf |