IL HB2519 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Statewide Organized Gang Database Act. Effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATEWIDE GANG DATABASE-REPEAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-08SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2019-05-02SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-04-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-034-000
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
202640ActRepealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback