IL HB2517 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Vacancy Fraud Act. Allows a taxing body or representative of a taxing body to file a vacancy fraud complaint with the county board of review if property is receiving vacancy relief and the property owner is not actively attempting to lease, sell, or alter the property. Sets forth factors in determining whether or not vacancy fraud has occurred. Sets forth penalties. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VACANCY FRAUD ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback