IL HB2517 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2011-04-15HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2011-03-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2011-03-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2011-03-07HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2011-02-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2011-02-18HouseFirst Reading
2011-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51001-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback