IL HB2517 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Construction Site Temporary Restroom Facility Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTH-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-03-13 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2009-02-25 Assigned to Executive Committee
2009-02-20 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-02-20 First Reading
2009-02-19 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback