IL HB2514 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Banking Act and the Savings Bank Act. Replaces "Commissioner" with "Secretary" in provisions related to the disclosure of information in order to update references to the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation. Provides that the Secretary may furnish confidential supervisory information to a Federal Home Loan Bank in connection with any bank that is a member of the Federal Home Loan Bank or in connection with any application by the bank before the Federal Home Loan Bank. Provides that a bank or other financial institution or its officers, agents, and employees may disclose confidential supervisory information to a Federal Home Loan Bank of which it is a member. Amends the Illinois Credit Union Act. Provides that relevant confidential supervisory information may be disclosed under specified circumstances to other agencies or entities having a legitimate regulatory interest, including, but not limited to, a Federal Home Loan Bank. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BANKS-FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017
2017-05-10SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-29SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-29SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 010-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Financial Institutions Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2052059012Amended CodeCitation Text
2053059.1Amended CodeCitation Text
205548.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback