IL HB2513 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that, for a person who is a resident in a facility licensed under the Specialized Mental Health Rehabilitation Act of 2013 or the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act for whom payments are made throughout a month and who is determined to be eligible for medical assistance, the State shall pay an amount in addition to the minimum monthly personal needs allowance authorized under the Social Security Act so that the person's total monthly personal needs allowance from both State and federal sources equals $100. Provides that any additional income needed by facilities for the purpose of providing adequate care shall be supplemented by the State; and that the personal needs allowance shall increase annually at the same rate as the Social Security cost-of-living adjustment to take effect on January 1 of each following year. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PERSONAL NEEDS ALLOWANCE $100

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-35New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback