IL HB2513 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cigarette Tax Act and the Tobacco Products Tax Act of 1995. Provides that a person who is both a licensed distributor and a licensed retailer shall be issued a single license number by the Department of Revenue. Provides that records may be kept electronically and may be kept at an out-of-state location so long as those records are made available upon reasonable notice for the purpose of investigation and control by the Department of Revenue. Amends the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. In provisions that provide for increased penalties for retailers that do not have training programs, provides that those training programs may be conducted electronically. Provides that, if a retailer has a training program in place prior to the effective date of the amendatory Act, has a training program approved by another state, or follows the guidelines set forth by the federal Food and Drug Administration, then that training program shall be deemed to meet the minimum standards in this State. Effective January 1, 2016.
Title
CIGARETTE TAX-TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0192 |
2015-07-30 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-07-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-000 |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2015 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 28, 2015 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-000-000 |
2015-04-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 130 | 11c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 130 | 4g | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 143 | 10-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 143 | 10-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 675 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |