IL HB2511 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that drugs prescribed for residents of licensed long-term care facilities shall not be subject to prior approval as a result of the 4-prescription limit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-EXCEPTION TO RX LIMIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-11HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-05HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 009-002-000
2018-04-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled
2018-03-07HouseMotion Prevailed
2018-03-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-01-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5.12Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback