IL HB2499 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0062
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0062
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Amends the definition of "authorized emergency vehicle" to include vehicles of the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority with a gross vehicle weight rating of 9,000 pounds or more and those identified as Highway Emergency Lane Patrol (rather than vehicles of the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority identified as Highway Emergency Lane Patrol). Allows vehicles of the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority with a gross vehicle weight of 9,000 pounds or more to use red or white oscillating, rotating, or flashing lights. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-TOLL HIGHWAY VEH-GVWR
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0062 |
2017-08-11 | House | Effective Date August 11, 2017 |
2017-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-002-000 |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Tollway Oversight Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Tollway Oversight Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 12-215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |