IL HB2498 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Chicago Casino Development Authority Act. Provides for the creation of the Chicago Casino Development Authority, whose duties include promotion and maintenance of a casino. Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975 and the Riverboat Gambling Act to authorize electronic gaming at race tracks (and makes conforming changes in various Acts). Further amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Makes various changes concerning Board members. Contains provisions concerning testing of horses at county fairs and standardbred horses. Provides that the Illinois Racing Board shall submit a report to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2018 that examines the feasibility of conducting electronic gaming at the Illinois State Fairgrounds. Further amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Changes the short title to the Illinois Gambling Act and changes corresponding references to the Act. Adds additional owners licenses, one of which authorizes the conduct of casino gambling in the City of Chicago. Makes changes in provisions concerning the admission tax and privilege tax. Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975, the Riverboat Gambling Act, and the Video Gaming Act to prohibit political contributions from certain licensees. Makes other changes. Contains a severability provision. Effective immediately.
Title
GAMING-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-03-08 | House | To Gaming Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |