IL HB2497 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Judges Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In provisions concerning the retirement annuity amount, specifies that the maximum annual salary of $106,800 is for all purposes under the Article; makes a related change in provisions concerning temporary total disability benefits. Provides that if 2 or more persons are eligible to receive survivor's annuities based on the same deceased participant that first serves as a judge after January 1, 2011, the calculation of the survivor's annuities shall be based on the total calculation of the survivor's annuity and divided pro rata. Makes changes in provisions concerning employee contributions to clarify to whom certain provisions apply. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-JRS-TIER 2
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Re-assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 18-125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 18-126.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 18-128.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 18-133 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2497&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2497.htm |