IL HB2495 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prevailing Wage Act. Provides that the prevailing wage shall not be less than the rate that prevails for similar work performed under collective bargaining agreements in the locality provided that the agreements cover at least 30% of the workers. Provides that, if bargaining agreements do not exist in the locality, the Department of Labor shall ascertain the prevailing wage to be paid under the Act. Applies to public works performed without a written contract. Requires that the Department publish prevailing wages schedules on its website.
Title
PREV WAGE BONA FIDE LABOR ORG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-04-12 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-04-12 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2017-04-10 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-04-05 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2017-04-05 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2017-04-05 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2017-04-04 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2017-04-03 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-04-03 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-011-000 |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 130 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 130 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 130 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 130 | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
820 | 130 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2495&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2495.htm |