IL HB2490 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Police and Downstate Firefighter Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, subject to appropriation, beginning with fiscal year 2018, a municipality that has a fund created after July 1, 2012 may apply to the Department of Insurance for reimbursement for administrative costs associated with the creation and administration of the fund, including, but not limited to, legal fees, actuarial analyses, continuing education for board members, and other qualified costs, as determined by the Department of Insurance. Provides that reimbursement may only be made for administrative costs associated with the first 5 years after the fund is created. Provides that a municipality that established a fund pursuant to a referendum is not eligible for reimbursement. Authorizes rulemaking. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-ART 3 & 4-ADMIN COSTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4053-144.7New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-138.7New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback