IL HB2485 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires a school board to publish a notice that the district's annual statement of affairs is available on the State Board of Education's Internet website and in the district's main administrative office (instead of requiring a summary of the statement of affairs to be published). Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-STATEMENT OF AFFAIRS
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] |
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-12 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-03-06 | House | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-03-06 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 003-002-001 |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |