IL HB2479 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. In provisions concerning certificates of registration, removes a requirement that publicly traded corporations must provide the last 4 digits of the social security numbers of their Chief Financial Officer, Chief Operating Officer, and any other officer or employee with responsibility for preparing tax returns.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ROTA-CERT OF REGISTRATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseTo Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351202aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback